WebHornbeck Offshore Services is a leading supplier of offshore transport services, including supply vessels, tankers and barges, primarily to support offshore and … WebTHE BOARD OF DIRECTORS Introduction The Board of Directors (the "Board") of Hornbeck Offshore Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation ("Hornbeck Offshore …
Did you know?
WebDirector Mr. Scott joined the Company as a director in July 2024. He is an experienced executive in the hospitality, leisure and entertainment industries with more than 25 years … Web28 jun. 2011 · COVINGTON, Louisiana– Hornbeck Offshore Services has appointed John T. Rynd and Kevin O. Meyers to its board of directors. Since June 2008, Rynd has served as CEO, president and a director of Hercules Offshore. Meyers is a consultant with 31 years of experience in the oil and gas industry.
Web27 jun. 2011 · Since June 2008, Mr. Rynd, 54, has served as the Chief Executive Officer and President, and as a director, of Hercules Offshore, Inc. (NASDAQ: HERO), a publicly traded global provider of offshore ... Web11 sep. 2024 · The company has a new board of directors led by Todd M. Hornbeck as chairman, alongside Evan Behrens, Kurt M. Cellar, Kevin O. Meyers, retired Admiral …
Web15 feb. 2012 · Hornbeck Offshore Services, Inc. announced that Nicholas L. Swyka has been appointed to its Board of Directors effective February 14, 2012. In connection with Mr. Swyka's appointment, the size of the... February 12, 2024 Web1 jul. 2013 · RIGHTS AGREEMENT . This RIGHTS AGREEMENT, dated as of July 1, 2013 (the “Rights Agreement”), is by and between Hornbeck Offshore Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (the “Company”), and Computershare Inc., a Delaware corporation (the “Rights Agent”).. RECITALS . WHEREAS, the Board of Directors desires to protect the …
Web11 sep. 2024 · The new board of directors is comprised of Todd M. Hornbeck (Chairman), Evan Behrens, Kurt M. Cellar, former Louisiana Governor Bobby Jindal, Kevin O. Meyers, Ph.D., Admiral John Richardson,...
Web26 sep. 2024 · Member Board Of Directors at Hornbeck Offshore Don Miller is based out of Houston, Texas, United States and works at Hornbeck Offshore as Member Board … burgundy wrap coatWeb7 nov. 2011 · Wednesday, May 26, 2004Hornbeck Offshore Services announced that two of its inside directors, Christian G. Vaccari and Richard W. Cryar, have resigned from the Board, effective immediately.... hallucinations bugsWeb27 jun. 2011 · COVINGTON, La., June 27, 2011 /PRNewswire/ -- Hornbeck Offshore Services, Inc. announced today that John T. Rynd and Kevin O. Meyers, Ph.D. have been appointed to its Board of Directors , ... hallucinations bookWeb2024-2024 OMSA Board of Directors Otto Candies, III, OMSA Chairman Vice-Chairman, Otto Candies, LLC Blake Miguez, OMSA Vice-Chairman ... Hornbeck Offshore Services, Inc. Lee Jackson Chief Executive Officer, Jackson Offshore Operators Court Ramsay President & C.E.O., Aries Marine Corporation Garrett Rice Chief Financial Officer, … hallucinations by jillWebMr. Todd Hornbeck was employed by the original Hornbeck Offshore Services, Inc., a NASDAQ-listed publicly traded offshore service vessel company with over 105 … burgundy wreath bowsWebcorporation ("Hornbeck Offshore Services") has adopted this Code of Business Conduct and Ethics for Members of the Board of Directors (the "Board Code of Conduct"). The Board Code of Conduct applies to all directors (each, a "Director" and together, the "Directors") of Hornbeck Offshore Services and its subsidiaries (collectively, the … burgundy wreathWeb20 mrt. 2024 · Hornbeck Offshore Linda Guercio Current Workplace Linda Guercio has been working as a Tax Director at Hornbeck Offshore for 15 years. Hornbeck Offshore is part of the Marine Shipping & Transportation industry, and located in Louisiana, United States. Hornbeck Offshore Location 103 Northpark Blvd Ste 300, Covington, Louisiana, … burgundy wrangler jeans